judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOUNTAIN STEAM VS. BAYRAMKUL C/W 52648

Case Information: 51543
Short Caption:MOUNTAIN STEAM VS. BAYRAMKUL C/W 52648Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:51543*, 52648 Related Case(s): 52648
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0601565Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/14/2008 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Stephenson & Dickinson, P.C. check no. 15196.
05/06/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-11185
05/14/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt 08-12094
05/20/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-12627
05/20/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -docketing statement. 08-12629
05/27/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. 08-13305
05/30/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 8/19/08. 08-13657
08/26/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-21967
08/28/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 08-22133
09/11/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/04/08 through 2/12/08. To Court Reporter: Peggy Hoogs. 08-23548
11/03/2008MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Appellant's Motion to Consolidate and Set New Briefing Schedule. Nos. 52648/51543 08-28012
11/06/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Peggy Hoogs to file certificate of delivery of transcripts dated 2/04/08 through 2/12/08. Due date: 10 days. 08-28473
11/12/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Terry Jenkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/5/08, 2/6/08, 2/8/08, 2/11/08, 2/12/08. 08-28827
12/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. A review of the district court docket entries indicates that the transcript of the February 4, 2008, proceedings was filed in the district court on October 17, 2008, and that transcripts of the February 7, 2008, proceedings also have been filed in the district court. If it has not already done so, appellant shall obtain copies of these transcripts from the district court clerk, and include in the appendix to the opening brief any copies that are necessary to this court's review of the issues presented on appeal. Hoogs is no longer obligated to file a certificate acknowledging delivery of the February 4, 2008, and February 7, 2008, transcripts in this court. 08-31099
12/26/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Appeals and Setting Briefing Schedule. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 24, 2009. 08-32800
02/23/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 51543/52648. 09-04566
02/23/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 51543/52648. 09-04567
03/30/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing Respondents Turgut Bayramkul and Bonnie Bayramkul: Lewis & Roca, LLP. Nos. 51543/52648 (09-07974). 09-07974
03/30/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 27, 2009. Nos. 51543/52648 (09-07977). 09-07977
04/29/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (30 days). Nos. 51543/52648 (09-10614). 09-10614
05/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time to file Answering Brief. Due: May 26, 2009. Nos. 51543/52648. 09-11785
05/29/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 51543/52648 (09-13427). 09-13427
06/05/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Due: June 25, 2009. Nos. 51543/52648. 09-14140
06/29/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 51543/52648. 09-15998
06/29/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols 1-3. Nos. 51543/52648. 09-15999
07/21/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 10, 2009. Nos. 51543/52648. 09-17819
08/10/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 51543/52648 (09-19509). 09-19509
08/21/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols 4-5. Nos. 51543/52648. 09-20417
12/16/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG Nos. 51543/52648. 09-30500
12/29/2009MotionFiled Motion. Respondents' Bill of Costs. Nos. 51543/52648. 09-31444
01/12/2010RemittiturIssued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $250.00 10-00924
01/12/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $250.00. 10-00056
01/12/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/21/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 13, 2010. 10-00056