judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONAHAN VS. MONAHAN

Case Information: 51542
Short Caption:MONAHAN VS. MONAHANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV25479Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/29/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
05/05/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 08-11168
05/05/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 08-11170
05/07/2008BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 08-11313
06/26/2008Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter concerning filing fee. 08-16361
07/01/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Appellant to Pay Filing Fee or Comply with NRAP 24(A) and to Properly Serve His Notice of Appeal and Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Appellant: 20 days to (1) pay the filing fee required by NRS 2.250 or (2) file in the district court a properly supported motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the district court and submit a file stamped copy of the motion to this court. 20 days from the date of this order to properly serve his notice of appeal and civil proper person appeal statement on counsel for respondent, Harold Kuehn of Gibson & Kuehn. Within that same time period, appellant shall file in this court properly completed certificates. We caution appellant that his failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal. We caution appellant that each document he files with this court must be properly served on respondent's counsel. If appellant files any further documents that have not been properly served or that are not accompanied by properly completed certificates of service, appellant shall be subject to sanctions, including the striking of the filed documents and the dismissal of this appeal. 08-16775
07/22/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with NRAP 24(A) and to Properly Serve Notice of Appeal and Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 08-18883
07/24/2008Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Certificate of Sevice - (My Case Appeal Statement). 08-19179
07/28/2008Notice/IncomingReceived Proof of Service. Certificate of Service for Notice of Appeal. FILED PER ORDER OF 9/15/08. 08-19379
07/28/2008Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. 08-19381
08/06/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Cecilia D. Thomas regarding Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. 08-20389
08/22/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Sandra Monahan - check no. 1102.
09/15/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due in District Court Case no. CV25479. Due 30 days. 08-23783
09/15/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Notice of Appeal. 08-19379
09/29/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-2. 08-25114
09/29/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/05/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. 09-03196
03/03/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-04631
03/03/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/16/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 6, 2009. 09-04631