Case Information: 51547 | |||
Short Caption: | STREET (JEFFREY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CR060031 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-11321 | |
05/07/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/28/08 and 4/3/08. Court Reporter: Linda Sarman. Filed in district court on: 5/01/08. | 08-11322 | |
05/14/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/7 and 1/24/08, and 3/31/08. Court Reporter: Linda Sarman. Filed in district court on: 5/12/08. (Amended Request for Rough Draft Transcripts). | 08-12170 | |
06/05/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Linda Sarman stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/07/08, 1/24/08, and 3/31/08. | 08-14281 | |
06/17/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 23, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-15415 | |
06/25/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-16238 | |
06/25/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-16240 | |
07/07/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-17160 | |
11/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Supplemental to Counsels Fast Track Statement. | 08-28113 | |
12/02/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Fn3 [This court shall take no action on and shall not consider the proper person documents Street has submitted to this court in this matter.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-30519 | |
12/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-31154 | |
12/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/07/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 2, 2009. | 08-31154 |