Case Information: 51538 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE, ATTORNEY GENERAL VS. MONTERO (BALLOT QUESTION) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0800285 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 06/13/2008 at 11:00 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Regional Justice Center |
Submission Date: | 06/13/2008 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/05/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/05/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-11095 | |
05/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Order Expediting Appeal and Submitting Appeal Without Brief or Oral Argument. | 08-11250 | |
05/06/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule and Setting Oral Argument. We conclude that expedited consideration of this appeal is warranted. Appellant: five days to file a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcript is requested. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be filed and served no later than May 23, 2008. Respondent's answering brief shall be filed and served no later than June 13, 2008. Appellant's reply brief, if any, shall be filed and served no later than June 20, 2008. We direct the clerk of this court to schedule this matter for oral argument before the full court on Tuesday, July 1, 2008. For this appeal, service of documents shall be personal or by facsimile transmission. Fn3 [. . .All documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile transmission with the clerk in Carson City.] | 08-11275 | |
05/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. for Reconsideration of Procederal Order. | 08-11374 | |
05/12/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 3/28/08. To: Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. | 08-11842 | |
05/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Response to Motion for Order Expediting Appeal and Submitting Appeal without Briefs or Oral Argument; and Response to Motion for Reconsideration of Procedural Order. | 08-12319 | |
05/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-12320 | |
05/16/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-12322 | |
05/20/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-12674 | |
05/20/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Supplement to Appendix to Appellant State of Nevada's Opening Brief. (Contains transcript of proceedings for 03/28/08). | 08-12676 | |
05/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions for Reconsideration and Granting Motion to Expedite. We have determined that the parties' briefs and oral argument may prove useful in resolving the appeall and we deny Montero's request to have this case decided without briefs or oral argument. We grant the motions to expedite the appeal further. Respondents shall have until May 30, 2008, to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall then have until June 6, 2008, to file and serve any reply brief. Additionally, we vacate the July 1 oral argument date and direct the clerk of this court to reschedule oral argument for Friday, June 13, 2008, at 11:00 a.m., before the en banc court, at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | 08-12760 | |
05/21/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stephanie Koetting stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/28/08. | 08-12793 | |
05/22/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Las Vegas on June 13, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. (En Banc) | 08-12847 | |
05/28/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 08-13367 | |
05/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-13707 | |
06/09/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-14465 | |
06/10/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. requesting to be pool camera in the courtroom on June 13, 2008 for case nos. 50895, 51539 and 51538. Submitted by KLAS TV 8 and Las Vegas One. | 08-14616 | |
06/10/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from David Kihara at the Las Vegas Review Journal requesting cameras in the courtroom. Nos. 50895/51509 cw 51564/51538/51539/51639/51735/51768/51798/51802. | ||
06/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Permission is granted for photographic and electronic media coverage of the aforesaid matter, for news purposes and not for commerical exploitation. David Kihara of the Las Vegas Review- Journal is designated as still photography pool coordinator and Robert Martinez of KLAS - TV is designated as video and audio pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m. and on June 13, 2008. Nos. 50895/51509/51564/51538/51539/51639/51735/51768/51798/51802. | ||
06/13/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. | ||
06/13/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC-MG/WM/JH/RP/MD/MC/NS | 08-15192 | |
07/11/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-15419 | |
07/11/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 14, 2008. | 08-15419 | |
07/24/2008 | Opinion/Non-Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Gibbons/Maupin/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta. 124 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 55. EN BANC. | 08-19079 | |
10/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to Publishers re: corrections in recently filed opinions. Nos. 47790, 48469, 49289, 50328, 51538, 51768 c/w 51798, 51802, and 47397 c/w 47398/47399/47400/ 47401. | 08-25429 |