Case Information: 51537 | |||
Short Caption: | BODDEN (KAREN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 62491 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 07CR0123 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Hardesty for Justice Gibbons | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 09/11/2009 at 9:50 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Sparks High School |
Submission Date: | 09/11/2009 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/05/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/05/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-11071 | |
05/06/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Christy Joyce stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/09/08, 01/10/08, 01/11/08, 01/14/08, 01/16/08, 01/17/08, 01/18/08, 01/22/08, and 01/23/08. | 08-11227 | |
05/09/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/21/07, 1/07 to 1/23/08, and 3/04/08. To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. | 08-11639 | |
05/09/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/21/07, 1/07 to 1/23/08, and 3/04/08. To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. (Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings). | 08-11641 | |
05/09/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/21/07, 1/07 to 1/23/08, and 3/04/08. To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. (Second Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings). | 08-11643 | |
05/20/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-12695 | |
07/03/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 11/21/07; 1/9/08; 1/10/08; 1/11/08; 1/14/08; 1/16/08; 1/17/08; 1/18/08; 1/22/08; 1/23/08; and 3/4/08. Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. | 08-17059 | |
09/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Brief. (30 days). | 08-23238 | |
09/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Opening Brief. (30 days). | 08-23542 | |
09/16/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Approving Stipulation. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 2, 2008. | 08-23903 | |
09/19/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 1/22/08 (Partial Transcript of Proceedings). Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. | 08-24383 | |
09/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-25289 | |
09/30/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-6. | 08-25292 | |
10/27/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. Notice of Error in Appellant's Opening Brief. | 08-27491 | |
11/03/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-28037 | |
12/08/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Attoney of Record and for Appointment of Substitute Counsel. | 08-31257 | |
12/08/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-31258 | |
12/09/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Remanding for Counsel. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 08-31374 | |
12/23/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 12/22/08 appointing Erik R. Johnson, Esq. as counsel for appellant. | 08-32561 | |
07/28/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 11, 2009 at 9:50 a.m. (NNP09-MC/NS/MG) | 09-18385 | |
08/13/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
08/13/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. (Justice Gibbons) | 09-19728 | |
08/26/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 09-20785 | |
09/11/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. NNP09-JH/MC/NS | ||
02/01/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/JH/NS | 10-02686 | |
02/26/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04173 | |
02/26/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/04/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2010. | 10-04173 |