Case Information: 55311 | |||
Short Caption: | TURNER VS. RICHARDS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A539099 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/26/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/22/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/22/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-01822 | |
01/22/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-01823 | |
02/01/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Arkeni Turner M.O.- 58550324921. | ||
02/26/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-05166 | |
03/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 10-08137 | |
04/26/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 7. | 10-10731 | |
04/26/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-29456 | |
11/23/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. | 10-30611 | |
11/23/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. | 10-30612 | |
11/23/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. | 10-30613 | |
11/30/2010 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Arkeni J. Turner. Money Order No. 18169099345. | ||
11/30/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Certificate of Service with attached documents. | 10-31033 | |
12/30/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-34128 | |
01/24/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-02223 | |
01/24/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/09/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 1, 2011. | 11-02223 |