Case Information: 51554 | |||
Short Caption: | GURSANSKY VS. SCHNEIDER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55369 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A513658 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/12/2008 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Stanley W. Pierce check no. 38209. | ||
05/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-11386 | |
05/13/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan | 08-11957 | |
05/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion to Replace Settlement Judge | 08-12516 | |
05/22/2008 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Judge Buchanan requests recusal from this case. | 08-12869 | |
05/23/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-13050 | |
06/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellee's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Replace Settlement Judge. | 08-13865 | |
06/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-13867 | |
06/06/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Correction to Docketing Statement. | 08-14426 | |
06/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellees' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-14427 | |
06/12/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Janet Trost | 08-14976 | |
06/25/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be held on 6/30/08. | 08-16197 | |
07/03/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-16980 | |
10/02/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Stayed. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The settlement proceedings are concluded and this appeal may proceed. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) shall remain suspended pending further order of this court upon resolution of respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-25494 | |
12/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Dismiss and Reinstating Briefing. Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | 08-32593 | |
01/09/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/28/07. To Court Reporter: Jessica Ramirez. | 09-00684 | |
03/25/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-07514 | |
03/25/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 2. | 09-07515 | |
04/29/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-10672 | |
05/13/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-11871 | |
06/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. | 09-15560 | |
08/25/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-20647 | |
09/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-21137 | |
09/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 4, 2010. | 09-21137 |