Case Information: 51561 | |||
Short Caption: | ARNOLD (SHELMADENE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C190425 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Cherry | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/08/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-11466 | |
05/08/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
07/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Rough Draft Transcript Request Form due: 5 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days or show cause. | 08-17117 | |
08/04/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-20277 | |
08/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30 days). | 08-20250 | |
08/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Request for Rough Draft Transcripts due: 5 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. | 08-20515 | |
08/15/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/10/03, 7/11/03, and 3/13/08. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: 7/09/08. | 08-21114 | |
08/26/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/10/03 and 7/11/03. Court Reporter: Michelle Ramsey. Filed in district court on: Not filed in district court. (Amended Rough Draft Transcript Request). | 08-21962 | |
09/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30 days). | 08-22912 | |
09/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. | 08-23305 | |
10/14/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-26422 | |
10/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-26423 | |
11/13/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-28922 | |
11/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track response and appendix received on November 13, 2008. | 08-29503 | |
11/19/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-28926 | |
11/19/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-28928 | |
05/13/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-11815 | |
06/09/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-13803 | |
06/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/17/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 12, 2009. | 09-13803 |