Case: 11-23-00200-CV
11-23-00200-CV
08/31/2023
Real Property
Michael Bruce Vaughn, individually and as Trustee of the G.D. and Sue Vaughn Trust and Linda Nell Vaughn
Shelby Isaacs Vaughan and Shaina Isaacs Bostick
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/01/2024 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
01/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
12/13/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/01/2024 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
01/12/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
01/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
12/13/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
11/16/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/09/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/13/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
09/14/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
09/07/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||
09/01/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
08/31/2023 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||
08/31/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
08/25/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
08/15/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||
06/27/2023 | Document filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/12/2024 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Vaughan, Shelby Isaacs | Appellee | Russell Casselberry Deborah Smith McClure |
Vaughn, Michael Bruce | Appellant | Garrett Ferguson |
Bostick, Shaina Isaacs | Appellee | Russell Casselberry Deborah Smith McClure |
Vaughn, Linda Nell | Appellant | Garrett Ferguson |
Trial Court Information
132nd District Court
Borden
Honorable Dana Cooley, Judge
1385
Terry Hanshew, Court Reporter