judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5904
A-5904
06/14/1956
Application for Writ of Error
ARMSTRONG TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY AND JAMES SHULTS
H. J. SHEARER, H. J. SHEARER AND JACK DAVIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/14/1956Response to Brief filedRespondent
08/08/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/04/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/10/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/21/1956Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/14/1956Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/14/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/14/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/14/1956Response to Brief filed
08/08/1956Response to Motion filed
08/08/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/04/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/10/1956Reply to Response
06/21/1956Response to Petition
06/14/1956Response to Petition
06/14/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/14/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/14/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Armstrong Tire and Rubber Company and James ShultsPetitioner
H. J. Shearer and Jack DavisRespondent
H. J. ShearerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information