Case: 05-21-01006-CV
05-21-01006-CV
11/17/2021
Miscellaneous/other civil
TC Mass Properties LLC
Glendell Thompson and Sheila Smith-Thompson
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/25/2022 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
04/20/2022 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
02/25/2022 | Record due | | |||||
02/14/2022 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
02/07/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
02/07/2022 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
02/04/2022 | Submitted | | |||||
01/20/2022 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
01/19/2022 | Letter received |
| |||||
11/17/2021 | Fee requested |
| |||||
11/17/2021 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
11/17/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
11/09/2021 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | | |||||
11/09/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/28/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/07/2028 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
04/20/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TC Mass Properties LLC | Appellant | Chad A. Norcross |
Glendell Thompson, et al. | Appellee | Shawn C. Laney |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Dallas
Honorable Mark Greenberg
CC-21-02623-E
Brooke Wagner