judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRIS (MELVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36287
Short Caption:HARRIS (MELVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36512
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C137409Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/15/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10225
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36150, 36151, 36155, 36159, 36278, 36287, 36311. Document No. 00-13553.
09/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Administratively Closing Appeal, Vacating Prior Order, and Directing Transmission of Record on Appeal. The clerk of this court shall administratively close the appeal in Docket No. 36287. The matter shall hereafter proceed in this court under Docket No. 36512. That portion of this court's order of August 4, 2000, regarding the transmission of the record in Docket No. 36287 is hereby vacated. Instead, the clerk of the district court shall have 120 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court as the record on appeal in Docket No. 36512, a certified copy of the complete trial court record from the district court's findings of fact, conclusions of law and order of June 28, 2000, denying appellant's post-conviction petition. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36287, 36512. 00-15462
09/01/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.