judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL MCKOY V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CT-1137
Short Caption:MICHAEL MCKOY V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF14894-09Filed Date:09/07/2010

Opening Event Date:09/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/18/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael Mckoy N
Miguel A. Serrano NN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
10/27/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
10/27/2010DISMISSED
11/18/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived