judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHARLES ALLEN HAYNES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0263)
Case Number:S-07-0263Case Docketed On:11/14/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHARLES ALLEN HAYNES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHARLES ALLEN HAYNES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCharles Allen HaynesDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
D. Michael Pauling
Terry L. Armitage
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 75
Citation:186 P.3d 1204 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/14/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Correction to record from District Court ClerkNotice-IncomingCorrectionFinal
12/28/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
02/04/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/03/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eight volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volumes IV-VI, transcripts; Volume VII, exhibits; Volume VIII, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/02/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/01/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/17/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/17/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for by Kayci Fuller.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal