judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5912
A-5912
06/19/1956
Application for Writ of Error
GUY A. THOMPSON, TRUSTEE, NEW ORLEANS, TEXAS AND MEXICO RAILWAY COMPANY
JAY LEE GIBSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/07/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/20/1956Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/08/1956Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/29/1956Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/07/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/27/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
06/19/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/07/1961Letter Filed
02/26/1958Opinion issued
10/21/1957Mandate issued
10/21/1957Order from Lower Court filed
05/14/1957Order from Lower Court filed
05/14/1957Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
02/19/1957Response to Motion filed
02/19/1957Response to Motion filed
02/07/1957Miscellaneous Motion
02/07/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/23/1957Opinion issued
11/20/1956Reply to Response
11/08/1956Response to Brief filed
10/29/1956Brief on the Merits
07/25/1956Document received (See Remarks)
07/25/1956Document received (See Remarks)
07/25/1956Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1956Reply to Response
06/27/1956Response to Petition
06/19/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/19/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Guy A. Thompson, Trustee, New Orleans, Texas and Mexico Railway CompanyPetitioner
Jay Lee GibsonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information