Case: 14-22-00690-CV
14-22-00690-CV
09/23/2022
Divorce
Deepa B. Willingham
Charles Richard Willingham
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/28/2023 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
06/16/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
05/15/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
| ||||
05/09/2023 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. | Appellant |
| ||||
03/30/2023 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/17/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
09/06/2023 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||
06/30/2023 | Response due | | |||||
06/28/2023 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
06/22/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
06/16/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
06/16/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
06/16/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
06/15/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
06/14/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
05/18/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/15/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
05/09/2023 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. |
| |||||
04/18/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
04/06/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
03/30/2023 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. |
| |||||
03/30/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
03/22/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
03/16/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
03/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/20/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
01/09/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
01/09/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
01/09/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
12/21/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
12/20/2022 | Clerks record due | | |||||
12/05/2022 | Letter filed |
| |||||
12/01/2022 | Response due | | |||||
11/16/2022 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
11/15/2022 | Clerks record due | | |||||
10/31/2022 | Notice of late record |
| |||||
10/28/2022 | Clerks record due | | |||||
10/26/2022 | Response due | | |||||
10/14/2022 | Response due | | |||||
10/13/2022 | Letter filed | | |||||
10/11/2022 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
10/11/2022 | Fee paid |
| |||||
10/10/2022 | Clerks record due | | |||||
10/10/2022 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||
10/10/2022 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
10/04/2022 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||
10/03/2022 | Court fee due | | |||||
09/28/2022 | Notification received that no record was taken | | |||||
09/28/2022 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
09/27/2022 | Document returned |
| |||||
09/26/2022 | Document returned |
| |||||
09/23/2022 | Notice of late record |
| |||||
09/23/2022 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
09/23/2022 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
09/23/2022 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
09/06/2022 | Reporters record due | | |||||
09/06/2022 | Record due | | |||||
08/02/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/05/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/17/2023 | Submitted | Submitted on briefs |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Willingham, Charles Richard | Appellee | Liza Alice Greene |
Willingham, Deepa B. | Appellant | Deepa B. Willingham |
Trial Court Information
245th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 245th District Court
2018-64132
Court Reporter, 245th District Court