Case: 14-23-00597-CV
14-23-00597-CV
08/21/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Sacks Weston LLC; Sacks & Weston P.C.; Amdrews B. Sacks; John K. Weston; Scott E. Diamond; and Diamond Law P.C.
Virage SPV I LLC
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/14/2023 | Proceeding stayed & suspended as of date petition filed in bankruptcy court. | | |||||
09/14/2023 | Order issued | ABATED |
| ||||
09/11/2023 | Notice filed |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | Notice filed |
| |||||
09/05/2023 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
09/01/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
08/31/2023 | Clerks record due | | |||||
08/31/2023 | Reporters record received not filed | REFUSED |
| ||||
08/31/2023 | Court fee due | | |||||
08/31/2023 | Record due | | |||||
08/29/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
08/29/2023 | Motion to stay disposed | NO ACTION TAKEN |
| ||||
08/28/2023 | Suggestion that party is in bankruptcy. No notice |
| |||||
08/25/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
08/25/2023 | Response due | | |||||
08/23/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
08/23/2023 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||
08/23/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
08/23/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
08/23/2023 | Motion to stay filed |
| |||||
08/21/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
08/21/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
08/21/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
08/21/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
08/18/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/14/2023 | Status | Bankruptcy |
09/14/2023 | Status | Appeal abated |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sacks Weston LLC; Sacks & Weston P.C.; Amdrews B. Sacks; John K. Weston; Scott E. Diamond; and Diamond Law P.C. | Appellant | Misty Annette Hataway - Cone |
Virage SPV I LLC | Appellee | Todd W Mensing |
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 152nd District Court
2023-19385
Court Reporter, 152nd District Court