judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5905
A-5905
06/15/1956
Application for Writ of Error
MERLIN QUINN, ET AL.
JAKE DUPREE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/08/1957Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
07/03/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/29/1956Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
10/10/1956Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
09/06/1956Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
06/30/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
06/15/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/08/1957Brief in Support of Petition
07/03/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/19/1957Opinion issued
10/29/1956Supplemental Brief filed
10/10/1956Supplemental Brief filed
09/06/1956Brief on the Merits
07/18/1956Document received (See Remarks)
06/30/1956Response to Petition
06/15/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/15/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jake DupreeRespondent
Merlin Quinn, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information