judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

David William Runyon v. The State of Texas

Case: 09-22-00043-CR
09-22-00043-CR
02/15/2022
Poss or Promotion of Child Pornography
David William Runyon
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
06/20/2023Post submission brief filedAppellant
06/01/2023Post submission brief receivedAppellant
11/29/2022Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
08/31/2022Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/15/2024Case stored
02/15/2024Mandate issued
02/14/2024Record checked in
01/17/2024Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
11/02/2023Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
08/16/2023Judgment Issued
08/16/2023Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/2023Post submission brief filed
06/20/2023Motion to file post submission brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/01/2023Motion to file post submission brief filed
06/01/2023Post submission brief received
05/18/2023Submitted
05/16/2023Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
05/15/2023Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
04/14/2023Set for submission on oral argument
04/06/2023Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
03/31/2023Letter issued by the court
11/29/2022Case ready to be set
11/29/2022Brief filed - oral argument requested
10/31/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/30/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/30/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/31/2022Brief filed - oral argument requested
08/03/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/02/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/01/2022Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
06/07/2022Order entered
05/25/2022Motion to remand to trial court
04/26/2022Exhibits filed
04/25/2022Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
04/11/2022Electronic Clerks Record Filed
04/07/2022Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/07/2022Extension of time to file reporters record filed
02/23/2022Docketing statement filed
02/23/2022Docketing statement due
02/15/2022Trial court certification filed
02/15/2022Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2024Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Runyon, David WilliamCriminal - AppellantMichael Corey Young
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasPhilip S. Harris
Amy Waddle
Trial Court Information
435th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Patricia Maginnis
21-03-03965-CR
Tavis Jacks
7rs TDCJ