judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5883
A-5883
05/31/1956
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHERN PACIFIC COMPANY
PRICE M. HUBBARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/24/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/30/1956Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/07/1956Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/31/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/04/1957Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
02/04/1957Order from Lower Court filed
12/28/1956Response to Motion filed
12/24/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/12/1956Dissenting opinion issued.
12/12/1956Opinion issued
07/30/1956Brief on the Merits
07/11/1956Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1956Brief on the Merits
05/31/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/31/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Price M. HubbardRespondent
Southern Pacific CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information