judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT; DAVID JAMISON, an individual; and ROBERT HOSZWA, an individual v. PARK COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS and WORTHINGTON GROUP OF WYOMING, LLC

Case Heading (S-07-0258)
Case Number:S-07-0258Case Docketed On:11/05/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT; DAVID JAMISON, an individual; and ROBERT HOSZWA, an individual v. PARK COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS and WORTHINGTON GROUP OF WYOMING, LLC
Full Title:NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT; DAVID JAMISON, an individual; and ROBERT HOSZWA, an individual, Appellants (Petitioners), v. PARK COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, Appellee (Respondent), and WORTHINGTON GROUP OF WYOMING, LLC, Appellee (Intervenor/Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNorthfork Citizens for Responsible DevelopmentAnthony Todd Wendtland
Debra J. Wendtland
AppellantDavid JamisonAnthony Todd Wendtland
Debra J. Wendtland
AppellantRobert HoszwaAnthony Todd Wendtland
Debra J. Wendtland
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Park County, WyomingBryan A. Skoric
James F. Davis
AppelleeWorthington Group, LLCLaurence W. Stinson
Dawn R. Scott

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Other, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2008 WY 88
Citation:189 P.3d 260

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/05/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/05/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/13/2007Brief - Appellants; received copy of brief on cd and designation of record. Extra copy of brief sent, no envelope for returnBriefAppellantFinal
01/25/2008Brief - Appellee - Park CountyBriefAppelleeFinal
01/25/2008Brief - Appellee - Intervenor, Worthington Group of Wyoming, LLCBriefAppelleeFinal
02/12/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/22/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Agency Record sixteen volumes.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Debra Wendtland for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James F. Davis, Deputy County Attorney for appellee Park County.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Laurence Stinson for appellee Worthington Group of Wyoming.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/02/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Debra J. Wendtland for appellants; Bryan Skoric, County Attorney, James F. David, Deputy County Attorney, Dawn Rae Scott, and Laurence W. Stinson, argument by Messrs. Davis and Stinson for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/02/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/09/2008Notice-Incoming - Additional authority from counsel for appellee CommissionersNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
07/29/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/14/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/14/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/18/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2). Record signed for 8/15/08 by Joyce Boyer.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal