judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JUAN CARLOS LOPEZ-PEREZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1132
Short Caption:JUAN CARLOS LOPEZ-PEREZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1386-10Filed Date:09/03/2010

Opening Event Date:09/03/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/09/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJuan Carlos Lopez-Perez Y
Sandi S. Rhee YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kathleen A. Connolly NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/03/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that Sandi Rhee, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
09/15/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sandi Rhee, Esquire
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES
09/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/10/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 23, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
11/12/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until completion of transcripts (no oppo)
12/10/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant and limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's receipt of the ordered transcript. (By: JAC)
01/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (8pgs/Tape) 8/26/10 proc. (morning)
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (82pgs/Tape) 8/26/10 proc. (afternoon) w/CD
01/13/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 10, 2010, wherein appellant was directed to file the brief within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court, and it appearing that the transcript has been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
01/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (9pgs/Tape) 8/26/10 proc. w/CD
03/03/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 13, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/04/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 4, 2011, which directed appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix, within 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (ETW)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/16/11. no oppo
05/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 16, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 31, 2011 (no oppo)
05/31/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/ appendix attached
06/08/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
06/08/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
07/08/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE r
07/12/2011FiledTMC- motion for summary affirmance
10/18/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/18/2011FiledAffirmed
11/09/2011FiledMandate