judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3544
B-3544
08/23/1972
Application for Writ of Error
FRANK WERTZ
RICHARDSON HEIGHTS BANK AND TRUST CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/14/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/29/1972Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/30/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
08/23/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/14/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/02/1973Dissenting opinion issued.
05/02/1973Opinion issued
10/25/1972Document received (See Remarks)
09/29/1972Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/30/1972Response to Petition
08/23/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/23/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frank WertzPetitioner
Robert A. HallAmicus Curiae
Richardson Heights Bank and Trust Co.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information