Case: 14-24-00030-CV
14-24-00030-CV
01/12/2024
Miscellaneous/other civil
John Deere Construction & Forestry Company
Richard Rodriguez, Irma Rodriguez, and Erasmo Benitez et al.
No
3rd Court of Appeals
01/12/2024
03-24-00001-CV
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2024 | Clerks record due | | |||||||
02/22/2024 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
02/22/2024 | Order entered |
| |||||||
02/15/2024 | Clerks record due | | |||||||
01/31/2024 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||
01/30/2024 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
01/30/2024 | Clerks record due | | |||||||
01/26/2024 | Response due | | |||||||
01/24/2024 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
01/24/2024 | Document returned |
| |||||||
01/23/2024 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
01/23/2024 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
01/16/2024 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
01/12/2024 | Court fee due | | |||||||
01/12/2024 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
01/12/2024 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | GRANTED |
| ||||||
01/12/2024 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |||||||
01/02/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
11/01/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
10/16/2023 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed | | |||||||
10/02/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/25/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rodriguez, Irma | Appellee | Gabriel Gutierrez |
Rodriguez, Richard | Appellee | Gabriel Gutierrez |
John Deere Construction & Forestry Company | Appellant | Jody Dewayne Jenkins |
Erasmo Benitez et al. | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
98th District Court
Travis
Honorable Daniella DeSeta Lyttle
D-1-GN-15-000769
Rachelle Primeaux