Case: 07-23-00177-CV
07-23-00177-CV
04/26/2023
Divorce
Craige Kevin Howlett
Corinne Howlett
No
3rd Court of Appeals
04/26/2023
03-23-00208-CV
7th Court of Appeals
04/26/2023
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/15/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Abated |
| ||||||
06/14/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
06/08/2023 | Notice to parties that suggestion of bankruptcy has been filed | | |||||||
06/06/2023 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
06/06/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
05/11/2023 | Appearance of counsel | | |||||||
05/09/2023 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
05/08/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
05/08/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
05/01/2023 | Email sent | | |||||||
04/26/2023 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||||||
04/26/2023 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |||||||
04/19/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
04/19/2023 | Affidavit filed |
| |||||||
04/18/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
04/17/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
04/17/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||||
04/07/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
04/06/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
01/30/2023 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | | |||||||
01/10/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/12/2023 | Status | Bankruptcy |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Howlett, Craige Kevin | Appellant | Nathan Kennedy Caroline Alonzo |
Howlett, Corinne | Appellee | Nicholas Bruno |
Trial Court Information
200th District Court
Travis
Honorable Jan Soifer
D-1-FM-21-004849
Michelle Williamson