Case: 05-24-00147-CV
05-24-00147-CV
02/09/2024
Contract
Main Street Food Hall LLC and Curtis Croft
CDM Builds, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/23/2024 | Notice filed |
| |||||
02/23/2024 | Fee paid |
| |||||
02/23/2024 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
02/23/2024 | Fee requested |
| |||||
02/12/2024 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
02/12/2024 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
02/09/2024 | Fee requested |
| |||||
02/09/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
02/09/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
01/12/2024 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/12/2024 | Status | Record due to be filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CDM Builds, Inc. | Appellee | Richard A. Illmer |
Main Street Food Hall LLC and Curtis Croft | Appellant | Cameron Squires |
Trial Court Information
44th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Veretta Lynn Frazier
DC-23-18369
Crystal R. Brown