Case: 09-24-00046-CV
09-24-00046-CV
02/09/2024
Interlocutory
Patricia Copley and Ravali Tarigopula
Kristin Guidry
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
03/07/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
02/27/2024 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
02/26/2024 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/22/2024 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/20/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/20/2024 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
| |||||
02/20/2024 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
02/16/2024 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
02/09/2024 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/09/2024 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | Accelerated | | ||||
02/09/2024 | Court fee due |
| |||||
02/09/2024 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | Accelerated |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/11/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
03/21/2024 | Status | Fee due in this court |
03/25/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Guidry, Kristin | Appellee | David Mestemaker Norman Straub |
Tarigopula, Ravali | Appellant | Ezequiel Zeke Moya Jr. Eduardo Moya Edward John Castillo |
The Medical Center of Southeast Texas | Unknown | Daniel Lewis Margaret L. Layrisson |
Copley, Patricia | Appellant | Joshua Caine Anderson Chastiti Nycole Horne |
Trial Court Information
172nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Mitch Templeton
23DCCV0196
Rene Mulholland