Case: 01-23-00315-CV
01-23-00315-CV
04/27/2023
Real Property
Jason Junker and Tiffany Sudela-Junker
Patricia Emerson
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/17/2023 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
07/28/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
06/28/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/09/2024 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||
08/17/2023 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
08/17/2023 | Reply brief due | | |||||
07/28/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
07/28/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
07/28/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
06/30/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/28/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
05/31/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
05/30/2023 | Record due | | |||||
05/29/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
05/17/2023 | Court fee due | | |||||
05/17/2023 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
05/10/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
05/10/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
05/04/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
04/27/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
04/27/2023 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
04/26/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
03/28/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/27/2024 | Submission | Briefs |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jason Junker and Tiffany Sudela-Junker | Appellant | Seth Alan Nichamoff |
Emerson , Patricia | Appellee | Jack Nichols |
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 334th District Court
2019-34181
Susan Miller