judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3579
B-3579
09/03/1972
Application for Writ of Error
GEORGE M. ROSS
DR. M. F. GOTTLIEB, DR. MALCOLM SHER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/04/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/20/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
09/19/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
09/03/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/04/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/20/1972Response to Petition
09/19/1972Response to Petition
09/08/1972Document received (See Remarks)
09/03/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. M. F. GottliebRespondent
George M. RossPetitioner
Dr. Malcolm SherRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information