Case: 13-24-00073-CR
13-24-00073-CR
01/12/2024
Murder
Marvin Louis Guy
The State of Texas
No
3rd Court of Appeals
01/11/2024
03-23-00825-CR
13th Court of Appeals - Corpus Christi
01/12/2024
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/28/2024 | Sealed clerk record filed | | |||
02/28/2024 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
02/28/2024 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
02/27/2024 | Corrected document requested | | |||
02/21/2024 | Corrected document requested | | |||
01/25/2024 | Corrected document requested | | |||
01/24/2024 | Trial court certification filed | | |||
01/24/2024 | Document filed | | |||
01/23/2024 | Email sent | | |||
01/12/2024 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals |
| |||
01/11/2024 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |||
01/09/2024 | Appearance of counsel | | |||
12/06/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||
11/27/2023 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | | |||
11/27/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||
11/27/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/26/2024 | Status | Court reporters record due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Guy, Marvin Louis | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Erika Copeland |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Henry L. Garza Hon. Brendan W. Guy |
Trial Court Information
27th District Court
Bell
Honorable John T. Gauntt
79711
Holly R. Wolfe
Life TDCJ-CID