judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

GeneralHealth Group, Inc., GeneralHealth Group of Texas, LLC and Ruth Berenstein v. Michel Neret, MD

Case: 01-24-00184-CV
01-24-00184-CV
03/06/2024
Contract
GeneralHealth Group, Inc., GeneralHealth Group of Texas, LLC and Ruth Berenstein
Michel Neret, MD
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
03/06/2024Case began in court of appeals
03/06/2024Notice of appeal received
03/04/2024Notice of appeal filed in trial court
01/31/2024Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/26/2024StatusAppellate court filing fee now due
04/01/2024StatusRecord due to be filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Michel Neret, MDAppelleeNoah Meek
GeneralHealth Group, Inc., GeneralHealth Group of Texas, LLC and Ruth BerensteinAppellantChristopher Cyrus
Trial Court Information
412th Judicial District Court
Brazoria
Honorable Judge 412th District Court
123111-CV
Jill Friedrichs