judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3577
B-3577
09/08/1972
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
FRANK B. MCGREGOR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/14/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/25/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
09/08/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/18/1972Response to Motion filed
12/14/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/29/1972Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1972Opinion issued
11/02/1972Motion to dismiss
09/25/1972Response to Petition
09/08/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/08/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frank B. McGregorRespondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information