judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3589
B-3589
09/13/1972
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF DUNCANVILLE, TEXAS
CITY OF WOODLAND HILLS, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/03/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
12/15/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/13/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/03/1974Response to Petition
12/27/1972Response to Motion filed
12/15/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/06/1972Opinion issued
09/13/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/13/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Woodland Hills, TexasRespondent
City of Duncanville, TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information