Case: 01-24-00034-CV
01-24-00034-CV
01/12/2024
Personal Injury
Dakota Reagan
Frerich Enterprises, Inc., Steve Frerich Enterprises, LLC, and Steve Frerich
No
3rd Court of Appeals
01/12/2024
03-23-00866-CV
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/06/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
03/06/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
02/08/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||
02/06/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
02/06/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
01/12/2024 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals |
| |||
01/12/2024 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |||
01/09/2024 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
01/04/2024 | Supplemental reporters record filed |
| |||
12/29/2023 | Fee paid | | |||
12/29/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
12/28/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||
12/20/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/10/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Reagan, Dakota | Appellant | Roland Christensen Andrew Gould Samuel Long Alec Paradowski Kurt B. Arnold |
Frerich, Steve | Appellee | Dareld R. Morris |
Steve Frerich Enterprises, LLC | Appellee | Dareld R. Morris |
Frerich Enterprises, Inc. | Appellee | Dareld R. Morris |
Trial Court Information
423rd District Court
Bastrop
Honorable Christopher Darrow Duggan
423-5730
Michele Fritsche