Case: 14-22-00745-CV
14-22-00745-CV
10/18/2022
Protective Order
Lakeesha Nicole Hampton
Rayla Tanae Thornton
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/23/2023 | Case stored | | |||||||
05/23/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
05/23/2023 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
04/28/2023 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||||
04/28/2023 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||||
03/29/2023 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
03/29/2023 | Motion for rehearing enbanc due | | |||||||
03/29/2023 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
03/14/2023 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
03/14/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
03/13/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
03/13/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/09/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
01/10/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||||
12/28/2022 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
12/08/2022 | Response due | | |||||||
12/07/2022 | Clerks record due | | |||||||
11/28/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
11/28/2022 | Response due | | |||||||
11/23/2022 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
11/22/2022 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||
11/21/2022 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
11/18/2022 | Clerks record due | | |||||||
11/18/2022 | Record due | | |||||||
11/17/2022 | Order entered |
| |||||||
11/14/2022 | Exhibits filed |
| |||||||
11/14/2022 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
11/10/2022 | Response due | | |||||||
11/02/2022 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||||
11/02/2022 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
10/31/2022 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
10/28/2022 | Court fee due | | |||||||
10/18/2022 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
10/18/2022 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
10/18/2022 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
10/14/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
09/19/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/23/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/23/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Thornton, Rayla Tanae | Appellee | Cristina Flores Escobar Cornelia A. Hartman Vanessa Goussen |
Hampton, Lakeesha Nicole | Appellant | Rodney Andre Brown |
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 280th District Court
2022-54001
Court Reporter, 280th District Court