Case Information: 49466 | |||
Short Caption: | DULIN-EVANS (MICHAEL) VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45686 , 46695 , 46707 , 46817 , 48671 , 49183 , 49605 , 52231 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C210081 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/18/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/18/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Expedited Emergency Petition for Writ of Certiorari. | 07-11033 | |
06/07/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn2[We have considered all documents received in this matter, and we conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-12492 | |
06/27/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada. | 07-14069 | |
06/28/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Addendum to Certificate of Service. | 07-14152 | |
08/02/2007 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. We have considered the petition for rehearing and conclude that rehearing is not warranted in this matter. The ACLU of Nevada filed a motion for leave to file brief of amicus curiae in this matter. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion. Any motion to submit a brief of amicus curiae should be filed within the appeal pending in Docket No. 49605. | 07-16978 | |
08/28/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-17063 | |
08/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |