judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARDS VS. BABCOCK

Case Information: 49468
Short Caption:EDWARDS VS. BABCOCKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A489014Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/18/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Alfred B. Edwards--check no. 55945888064.
05/18/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 07-11052
06/18/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Affidavit in Lieu, Court Reporter, Peggy Isom, State's, No Transcript's Exist on 06/04/2007 filed in district court on June 5, 2007. 07-13249
06/18/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Amended Receipt of Certificate of Service, Acknowledgement of Service, Proof. 07-13250
06/25/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Amended, Receipt of Certificate of Service Acknowlegement of Service, Proof. 07-13806
06/26/2007BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Appellant's Statement of the Evidence, When, No Transcript, was Made (w/numerous documents attached.) 07-14038
07/13/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Notice, Application Motion for Leave, (Opt Out), Civil Appeals Pilot Program, Extension of Time to file, Opening Brief, With, Deposit of Jury Fee's, (First Request.) 07-15298
08/17/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Exemption from Pilot Program, Directing Transmission of the Record and Establishing Briefing Schedule, and Denying Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Request for Appointment of Counsel. Appellant's Opening Brief due 60 days. Record on Appeal due 30 days. We deny appellant's motion for appointment of counsel. 07-18217
08/29/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 9. 07-19158
10/23/2007MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion, Request Leave of the Court, for Stipulation, to a, Three Week Extension of Time to file, Appellant's Opening Brief, due to Excusable Neglect, Three Weeks (Second Request.) 07-23362
11/08/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Peggy Isom in rseponse to 6/28/07 transcript request form. No transcript was prepared on 6/19/07. 07-24463
11/09/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Response in Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Statement. 07-24525
11/09/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Respondents Response in Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Statement. 07-24531
11/16/2007MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Amended Notice Application Motion, Request Leave of the Court, for Stipulation, to a, Three Week Extension of Time to file, Appellant's Opening Brief, due to Excusable Neglect, Three Weeks. Amended (Second Request) 07-24937
01/11/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Denying Request to Compel Production of Various Documents. We deny appellant's request to compel the production of any additional documents. We deny the request, contained in his second motion for an extension of time, that any extension run from the date these documents are provided to him. We conclude that appellant's request for an extension of time to file his opening brief should be granted. Appellant: 21 days to file the opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as detailed in our August 17 order. Appellant cautioned. We deny respondents' request that we affirm the district court. 08-00747
02/12/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Request' to Supreme Court Grant Extension of Two Week's to Appellants' Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Brief. 08-03425
02/21/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Response in Opposition to Appellant's Request to Supreme Court Grant Extension of Two Week's to Appellants' Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Brief (Third Request) and Countermotion to Dismiss and for Attorney Fees and Costs. 08-04249
03/06/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion for Extension of Time to Fille his Opening Brief and Directing Appellant to File his Opening Brief within Seven days of this Order's Date. Appellant shall not be granted any further extensions of time to file his opening brief. Fn1 [Having considered respondents' request for sanctions, we conclude that sanctions are not warranted and we deny that request. Additionally, in light of this order, we deny respondents' request that this court affirm the judgment on appeal based on appellant's failure to timely file his opening brief.] 08-05660
03/10/2008Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. 08-05949
03/10/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Proper person appendix-consisting of nine volumes plus an index, copies of three other documents (two previously filed in the supreme court, one filed in the district court), district court minutes and index. Labeled as Vols. 1 through 15. 08-05951
03/18/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Reply to Respondents Response in Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Statement. 08-06676
03/18/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Reply to Errata to Respondents Response in Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Extend time for filing Opening Statement. 08-06679
03/18/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Requesting to file Opening Brief Late with Reply to Respondents, Response in Opposition to Appellant's Request to Supreme Court Grant Extension of Two Week's to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Brief (Third Request) with Opposition to Courntermotion to dismiss and Opposition to Respondent's Request for Attorney's Fee's and Cost's. 08-06684
03/18/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Certificiate of Servie Acknowledgement of Service, Proof. 08-06687
03/20/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Receipt of Certificate of Service Acknowledgement of Service, Proof. PER ORDER OF 10/3/08 DETACHED APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF AND FILED. 08-06931
04/23/2008BriefReceived Answering Brief. Respondents Lewis Babcock and Nevada Checker Cab Corporation's. 08-10118
05/29/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Notice, Motion-Memorandum of Costs #3 & Statement of Bill of Costs & Fee's (Verified) NRCP 15(d) To Supplement, Pleading All, from Special Damages NRCP 9(g). 08-13591
05/30/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion Request Leave of the Court, for Stipulation to Extend Time, for the Appellant to File; the Reply Brief for 30 days Due to Excusable Neglect. (First Request) 08-13668
06/20/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Plantiff's Opposition Defendants' Motion to Strike (see document for complete title) filed in district court 6/17/08; Receipt of Certificate of Service filed in district court 6/17/08, Motion to Strike Plantiff's Bill of Costs(see document for complete title) filed in district court 6/3/08. 08-15912
07/09/2008BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. 08-17519
07/09/2008BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. 08-17521
11/03/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn6 [We grant appellant's three motions filed on March 18, 2008, seeking to enlarge the time to file his opening brief. We direct the clerk of this court to separate appellant's opening brief from the proof of service filed by him on March 20, 2008, and file it separately as his opening brief. We further direct the clerk to file respondents' answering brief and appendix provisionally received on April 23, 2008, and to file appellant's notice provisionally received on April 2, 2008. Because appellant's reply brief was already filed on July 9, 2008, we deny as moot his May 30, 2008, motion to enlarge the time for him to file his reply brief.] Fn8 [We deny as meritless appellant's motion for costs filed on May 29, 2008, and all other requests for relief made by appellant as part of this appeal. We further deny respondents' request for attorney fees that was made in their answering brief. We also note that appellant has not challenged the district court's award of $1,800 in attorney fees to respondents for having to file a motion to enforce the settlement, so we will not address that issue on appeal. ] NNP08C-MG/MC/NS. 08-27972
11/03/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-28035
11/03/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents Lewis Babcock and Nevada Checker Cab Corporation's Answering Brief. 08-10118
11/03/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondents Lewis Babcock, individually; and Nevada Checker Cab Corporation, Inc.'s Appendix. 08-10120
11/03/2008Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Receipt of Certificate of Service Acknowledgement of Service, Proof. Filed in the Dist Ct 3/28/08. 08-08297
11/26/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Notice, Motion Appellant Request's, Leave of the Court with Stipulation for Thirty (30) Day Extension of Time, to File, a Petition for Re-Hearing to the Supreme Court of Nevada. 08-30284
12/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for Extension of Time to File Rehearing Petition. Fn2 [Any further documents submitted by any of the parties to this appeal shall be returned, unfiled, by the clerk of this court.] 08-30815
01/28/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-02405
01/28/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/09/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 30, 2009. 09-02405