Case Information: 53351 | |||
Short Caption: | PREMIER PROPERTY MGMT. VS. STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A546732 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/06/2009 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ballard Spahr Andrews & Ingersoll, LLP check no. 001679. | ||
03/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-05278 | |
03/06/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt | 09-05887 | |
03/30/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 09-07993 | |
04/28/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-10461 | |
04/28/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. | 09-10462 | |
05/01/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Notice of Plaintiffs Premier Property Management, LLC and Robert Page's Association of Counsel. Representing appellant: Kurt A. Smith, Esq./Smith & Kim Attorneys at Law. | 09-10910 | |
05/01/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Notice of Plaintiffs Premier Property Management, LLC and Robert Page's Association of Counsel. | 09-10914 | |
05/04/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/5/09 | 09-10949 | |
05/07/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Appellants' Motion to Extend the time to File the Docketing Statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received 4/23/09. | 09-11335 | |
05/07/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-10119 | |
05/07/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Certificate of Service of Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. | 09-11341 | |
05/07/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Notice of Plaintiff's Premier Property Management, LLC and Robert Page's Association of Counsel. | 09-11364 | |
06/09/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Original Stipulation to Dismiss is appended. | 09-14384 | |
06/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. | 09-14385 | |
06/15/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH | 09-14864 | |
06/15/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |