Case Information: 53365 | |||
Short Caption: | CHAVEZ (EDILFREDO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 63600 , 69392 , 69392-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C239034 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Chief Justice Pickering for Justice Douglas Justice Douglas for Justice Hardesty Justice Hardesty for Chief Justice Pickering | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/08/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-05566 | |
03/04/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment. District Court Judgment due: 30 days. | 09-07128 | |
03/30/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on March 19, 2009. Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial). | 09-07983 | |
04/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 09-08520 | |
04/14/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/3/07 (K. Schmidt), 2/26/08, 7/15/08, 7/16/08, 2/25/09, 12/1/08, 12/2/08, 12/3/08, 12/4/08, 12/5/08, 12/8/08 (M. Schorn), 11/25/08 (J. D'Amato). | 09-09393 | |
04/14/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-09394 | |
04/23/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/3/07. | 09-10151 | |
05/13/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/26/08, 7/15/08, 7/16/08, 12/1/08, 12/2/08, and 12/3/08. | 09-11831 | |
05/26/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/04/08, 12/05/08, 12/08/08, and 2/25/09. | 09-13018 | |
08/04/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to File Opening Brief | 09-19025 | |
08/04/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge the time to file opening brief is approved. Due date: September 3, 2009. | 09-19026 | |
09/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 09-21434 | |
09/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due October 5, 2009. | 09-21564 | |
10/05/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-24298 | |
10/05/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1. | 09-24299 | |
10/05/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2. | 09-24300 | |
10/05/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3. | 09-24301 | |
10/05/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4. | 09-24302 | |
10/05/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5. | 09-24303 | |
10/05/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 6. | 09-24304 | |
11/03/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-26799 | |
12/18/2009 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
02/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-03556 | |
02/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/12/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 11-14157 | |
06/06/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-16458 | |
06/06/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/22/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 15, 2011. | 11-16458 |