judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMBERLAKE VS. KAPLAN

Case Information: 53353
Short Caption:TIMBERLAKE VS. KAPLANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0502569Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/10/2009 / Weise, CathySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/02/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Douglas K. Fermoile check no. 2381.
03/02/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-05284
03/10/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Cathy Valenta Weise 09-06140
03/16/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-06655
03/23/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 09-07280
03/30/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/22/09 09-07910
04/29/2009MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference 09-10628
04/30/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH 09-10702
04/30/2009Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.