Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
03/03/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 8. | | 09-05357 |
03/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. District Court Docket Entires, Judgment of Conviction filed on 2/10/09, Distict Court Minutes, and Exhibit List. | | 09-05359 |
03/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. MENDOZA-C233996 for Frederick Mendoza, Defendant | | 09-05855 |
03/06/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | | 09-05857 |
03/12/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 09-06443 |
03/20/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 09-07126 |
04/20/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 09-09796 |
04/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to extend time to file the docketing statement. The clerk of this court shall filed appellant's docketing statement received on April 20, 2009. | | 09-10074 |
04/23/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 09-09797 |
06/01/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's counsel shall file and serve the opening brief within 10 days of the date of this order or file a motion for an extension of time based upon a showing of good cause. | | 09-13513 |
06/01/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 09-13527 |
06/03/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: July 10, 2009. | | 09-13733 |
07/07/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Correction of Record on Appeal. | | 09-16585 |
07/10/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Supplemental Record due: 20 days. Opening Brief due: 80 days. | | 09-17035 |
08/03/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 9 through 12. | | 09-18931 |
09/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 09-23518 |
10/02/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief due: 10/28/09. | | 09-24171 |
10/27/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Enlarged Opening Brief. | | 09-26302 |
10/27/2009 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. Via E-Flex. (FILED PER ORDER 10/28/09). | | |
10/27/2009 | Appendix | Received Appendix to Opening Brief. Via E-Flex. (FILED 10/28/09). | | |
10/28/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received via E-Flex on October 27, 2009. Answering Brief due: 60 days. | | 09-26416 |
10/28/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 09-26422 |
10/28/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | | 09-26424 |
12/28/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (60) days. | | 09-31346 |
12/29/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 26, 2010. | | 09-31415 |
02/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 10-05033 |
03/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 27, 2010. | | 10-05749 |
04/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 10-10810 |
05/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: May 27, 2010. | | 10-11206 |
05/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 56 Page Answering Brief. | | 10-13800 |
05/27/2010 | Brief | Received Answering Brief. (via E-Flex). | | |
05/27/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | | 10-13801 |
05/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received May 27, 2010. Reply Brief due: 45 days. | | 10-13958 |
05/28/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 10-13959 |
07/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 10-17675 |
07/14/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 16, 2010. | | 10-18029 |
08/11/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 10-20798 |
08/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: September 15, 2010. | | 10-21461 |
09/16/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 10-23908 |
09/16/2010 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
11/08/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 5, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the En Banc Court. | | 11-34359 |
11/18/2011 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order. This is an appeal from a judgment of conviction and the imposition of a sentence of death. This appeal is currently scheduled for argument before the en banc court on December 5, 2011, at 10:00 a.m., for 30 minutes. The time for oral argument is expanded to 60 minutes, allowing 30 minutes per side. | | 11-35797 |
11/21/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 11-35923 |
12/05/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
05/23/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." EN BANC | | 12-16279 |
06/12/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 12-18358 |
08/01/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 12-24257 |
08/03/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay of Remittitur. | | 12-24452 |
08/10/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Staying Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until December 3, 2012. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by December 3, 2012, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by December 3, 2012, the remittitur shall issue on December 4, 2012. | | 12-25211 |
11/27/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed October 30, 2012 and placed on the docket November 19, 2012 as Case No. 12-7327. | | 12-37333 |
01/18/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | | 13-02138 |
01/18/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 13-02144 |
01/18/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
01/28/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 24, 2013. | | 13-02144 |