Case Information: 53354 | |||
Short Caption: | PROGRESSIVE LEADERSHIP ALLIANCE VS. TRUCKEE MEADOWS REGIONAL PLANNING COMM. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0800611 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/10/2009 / Weise, Cathy | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John L. Marshall check no. 4571. | ||
03/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-05294 | |
03/10/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Cathy Valenta Weise | 09-06141 | |
03/20/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-07105 | |
03/20/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07106 | |
03/30/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and and should be removed from the settlement conference program. | 09-07908 | |
03/30/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Upon Settlement Judge - docketing statement. | 09-07985 | |
03/31/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Jones Vargas - counsel for respondent Spring Mountain). | 09-08078 | |
04/02/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. | 09-08250 | |
05/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Substitution of Counsel. Jones Vargas shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to either file and serve a proper substitution of counsel, signed by it, new counsel, and the Spring Mountain Nevada Development Company, or to file and properly serve a motion to withdraw as counsel. | 09-11237 | |
05/20/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Stephen C. Mollath of Prezant & Mollath in place of Brett J. Scolari of Jones Vargas as counsel for Spring Mountain. | 09-12585 | |
07/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 09-17162 | |
07/21/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief. Due: July 31, 2009. To date, appellants have failed to file a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript is to be requested. Due: 10 days. We caution appellant that failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. | 09-17849 | |
08/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 09-18884 | |
08/10/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and having reviewed the stipulation filed on August 5, 2009, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42 (b). CLK- NNP-TL. | 09-19396 | |
08/10/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |