Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from R. Clay Hendrix, P.C. check no. 5057. | | |
03/04/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 09-05552 |
03/19/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant Exposure Graphics. | | 09-07019 |
03/19/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant Exposure Graphics. | | 09-07020 |
03/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Stipulation to Consolidate Docket Nos. 52623 and 53362 and to Stay Briefing Schedule. Nos. 52623/53362. | | 09-07513 |
04/10/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. Order Consolidating Appeals and Suspending Briefing Schedules. The briefing schedules in these consolidated appeals are hereby suspended. Status report due 30 days. (09-08995). | | |
04/10/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. Order Consolidating Appeals and Suspending Briefing Schedules. The briefing schedules in these consolidated appeals are hereby suspended. Status report due 30 days. | | 09-08995 |
05/13/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. Status Report Regarding District Court Proceedings. (Appellant). Nos. 52623/53362. (09-11849) | | |
05/13/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. Status Report Regarding District Court Proceedings. (Appellant). Nos. 52623/53362. | | 09-11849 |
06/08/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 54069 PER 06/29/09 ORDER. | | |
06/08/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 54069 PER 06/29/09 ORDER. | | 09-14271 |
06/29/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Assigning Appeal to New Docket, Directing Compliance with the NRAP, and Reinstating Briefing. On June 3, 2009, appellant Rapid Mounting Display filed an amended notice of appeal, challenging the May 8 order awarding attorney fees. An amended notice of appeal is improper. We direct the clerk of this court to assign the amended notice of appeal docketed in these consolidated appeals on June 8, 2009, to a new docket. The clerk shall then consolidate the newly docketed June 3 appeal with these appeals. Rapid Mounting Display has 10 days from the date of this order within which to pay the filing fee for the June 3 appeal from the May 8 attorney fees order. Failure to pay the filing fee may result in the dismissal of that appeal. The June 3 appeal is exempted from the settlement conference program. Transcript request and docketing statement requirements apply. Briefing is reinstated in the three consolidated appeals. Rapid Mounting Display: 90 days to file and serve an opening brief and appendix. Appellant Exposure Graphics: 30 days from opening brief to file a combined answering brief and opening brief. Rapid Mounting Display: 30 days from the date that combined brief is served to file an answering brief combined with any reply brief. Thereafter, Exposure Graphics shall have 30 days to file any reply brief. Nos. 52623/53362 [09-15970] | | |
06/29/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (Amended). Appellant Rapid Mounting Display in docket no. 52623. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 (09-16011). | | |
06/29/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Assigning Appeal to New Docket, Directing Compliance with the NRAP, and Reinstating Briefing. On June 3, 2009, appellant Rapid Mounting Display filed an amended notice of appeal, challenging the May 8 order awarding attorney fees. An amended notice of appeal is improper. We direct the clerk of this court to assign the amended notice of appeal docketed in these consolidated appeals on June 8, 2009, to a new docket. The clerk shall then consolidate the newly docketed June 3 appeal with these appeals. Rapid Mounting Display has 10 days from the date of this order within which to pay the filing fee for the June 3 appeal from the May 8 attorney fees order. Failure to pay the filing fee may result in the dismissal of that appeal. The June 3 appeal is exempted from the settlement conference program. Transcript request and docketing statement requirements apply. Briefing is reinstated in the three consolidated appeals. Rapid Mounting Display: 90 days to file and serve an opening brief and appendix. Appellant Exposure Graphics: 30 days from opening brief to file a combined answering brief and opening brief. Rapid Mounting Display: 30 days from the date that combined brief is served to file an answering brief combined with any reply brief. Thereafter, Exposure Graphics shall have 30 days to file any reply brief. Nos. 52623/53362 [09-15970] | | 09-15970 |
06/29/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (Amended). Appellant Rapid Mounting Display in docket no. 52623. Nos. 52623/53362 (09-16011). | | 09-16011 |
07/16/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (Appellant Rapid Mounting Display in docket no. 52623). Nos. 52623/53362 (09-17507). | | |
07/16/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (Appellant Rapid Mounting Display in docket no. 52623). Nos. 52623/53362/54069 (09-17507). | | 09-17507 |
07/24/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 (09-18203). | | |
07/24/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-18203 |
07/27/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant/Cross-Respondent in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. (09-18306) | | |
07/27/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. (09-18308) | | |
07/27/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant/Cross-Respondent in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-18306 |
07/27/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-18308 |
08/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. (Rapid Mounting) Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 | | |
08/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. (Rapid Mounting) Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 | | |
08/07/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Third Amended Notice of Appeal. (Rapid Mounting) Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 | | |
08/07/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Third Amended Notice of Appeal. (Rapid Mounting) Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 | | |
08/14/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Fourth Amended Notice of Appeal. (Rapid Mounting) Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 | | |
08/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Fourth Amended Notice of Appeal. (Rapid Mounting) Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 | | |
08/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. (Exposure Graphics) Appellant/Cross-Respondent in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 | | |
08/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. (Exposure Graphics) Appellant/Cross-Respondent in Docket No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 | | |
09/16/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Amended. Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Filed in No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. (09-22439) | | |
09/16/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Amended. Respondent/Cross-Appellant in Docket No. 54069. Filed in No. 54069. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. (09-22439) | | |
09/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (30) days. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. (09-23469) | | |
09/25/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: October 28, 2009. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. (09-23475) | | |
09/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (30) days. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-23469 |
09/25/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: October 28, 2009. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-23475 |
10/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The parties shall have 15 days from the date of this order to show cause why the July 31, 2009, fourth amended judgment should not be deemed the final, appealable judgment on remand and the appeals from all prior orders dismissed. Briefing is suspended. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 (09-24438). | | |
10/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. The parties shall have 15 days from the date of this order to show cause why the July 31, 2009, fourth amended judgment should not be deemed the final, appealable judgment on remand and the appeals from all prior orders dismissed. Briefing is suspended. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-24438 |
10/15/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Respondent counsel R. Clay Hendrix, P.C. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-25192 |
10/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Exposure Graphics. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 (09-25940). | | |
10/23/2009 | Motion | Received Response to Order to Show Cause. Exposure Graphics. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 (09-25941). (FILED PER ORDER 11/17/09). | | |
10/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Exposure Graphics. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-25940 |
10/23/2009 | Motion | Received Response to Order to Show Cause. Exposure Graphics. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. (FILED PER ORDER 11/17/09). | | 09-25941 |
10/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Rapid Mounting Display. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 (09-26114). | | |
10/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Rapid Mounting Display. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-26114 |
11/17/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the response received on October 23, 2009. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 (09-28069). | | |
11/17/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Exposure Graphics. Nos. 52623/53362/54069 (09-25941). | | |
11/17/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the response received on October 23, 2009. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-28069 |
11/17/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Exposure Graphics. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 09-25941 |
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "'The appeals from the interlocutory orders, assigned to Docket Nos. 52623 and 53362, are hereby dismissed for lack of jurisdiction.' The appeal and cross-appeal in Docket No. 54069, appellant Exposure Graphics shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve its opening brief and appendix.." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 10-03289 |
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "'The appeals from the interlocutory orders, assigned to Docket Nos. 52623 and 53362, are hereby dismissed for lack of jurisdiction.' The appeal and cross-appeal in Docket No. 54069, appellant Exposure Graphics shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve its opening brief and appendix.." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. Nos. 52623/53362/54069. | | 10-03282 |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 10-04199 |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 10-04200 |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | | 10-04199 |
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | | 10-04200 |