Case Information: 53361 | |||
Short Caption: | WAGNER VS. WEBSTER JONES & AGRAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - CV0610030 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kimberly D. Price and Emma Wagner check no. 1477. | ||
03/04/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-05542 | |
03/09/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to Pershing County Clerk, returning amended notice of appeal and requesting that it be resubmitted with all documents as required by NRAP 3(e). | 09-05927 | |
03/11/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 09-06270 | |
03/11/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondents. | 09-06275 | |
08/26/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Fn1 [Appellant's failure to file a Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement constitutes an independent basis for dismissal.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-20772 | |
09/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-21168 | |
09/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/28/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 23, 2009. | 09-21168 |