judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JITNAN VS. OLIVER C/W 53225

Case Information: 53340
Short Caption:JITNAN VS. OLIVER C/W 53225Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 53225 *, 53340Related Case(s): 52720 , 53225
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A501759Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/03/2009 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/16/2011How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/26/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
02/26/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-05101
02/26/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 09-05102
02/26/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 09-05103
03/03/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith 09-05426
03/04/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Mainor Eglet Cottle, LLP - check no. 28240.
03/11/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 09-06216
03/17/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-06704
03/26/2009Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 09-07583
03/30/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. 53225 and 53340. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 09-07921
04/13/2009Other Other. Order Reinstating Briefing and Consolidating Appeals. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondents: 30 days from appellants' opening brief to file combined answering brief for appeals and opening brief for cross-appeal. Appellants: 30 days from respondents' combined brief to file combined reply brief for their appeals and answering brief for cross-appeal. Respondents; 30 days from appellants' combined brief to file reply brief for cross-appeal, if necessary. 53225/53340
04/30/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/22/05, 1/11/06, 2/27/06, 3/15/06, 5/03/06, 5/31/06, and 9/20/06. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. Nos. 53225/53340 (09-10744). (Respondents/Cross-Appellants).
05/01/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/03/08 - 11/10/08. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. Nos. 53225/53340 (09-10887). (Appellants/Cross-Respondents).
05/18/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/22/05, 2/27/06, 9/20/06, 9/25/06, 1/11/06, 3/15/06, 5/3/06. Proceeding 5/31/06 unable to prepare, chamber's matter. Nos. 53225/53340. (09-12249)
06/11/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/3/08 through 11/7/08 and 11/10/08. Nos. 53225/53340. (09-14542)
06/29/2009MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 10, 2009. Nos. 53225/53440 (09-15959).
07/21/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Filing Opening Brief. (30) days. Nos. 53225/53340. (09-17824)
07/28/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief due September 9, 2009. Nos. 53225/53340 (09-18374).
08/07/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing Responsents/Cross-Appellants: Lewis & Roca LLP/Las Vegas. Nos. 53225/53340. (09-19277)
10/15/2009MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Answering Brief due: November 12, 2009. Nos. 53225/53340. (09-25132)
11/13/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. (30) days. Nos. 53225/53340. (09-27720)
11/25/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief due: December 14, 2009. Nos. 53225/53340 (09-28756).
12/16/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion by Respondents/Cross-Appellants for Extension of Time for Filing Answering Brief and Opening Brief for Cross-Appeal. Nos. 53225/53340 (09-30604).
12/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file answering brief and opening brief on cross-appeal. Due 1/14/10. Nos. 53225/53340 (09-31564).
01/19/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 53225/53340 (10-01457).
02/03/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of time in Which to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (Respondents/Cross-Appellants). Nos. 53225/53340. (10-02970)
02/05/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting in Part and Denying Part Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents/Cross-Appellants: to file combined briefs: 2/10/10. We deny the January 29th motion as moot. Nos. 53225/53340 (10-03390).
02/05/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Respondents' Cross-Appeal. Nos. 53225/53340 (10-03424).
02/08/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. Nos. 53225/53340. (10-03516)
02/08/2010AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. Vols 1-4 (Attached-Impact Video on CD). Nos. 53225/53340. (10-03519)
02/12/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Dismissing Cross-Appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption in Docket No. 53225 to reflect the dismissal of respondents' cross-appeal. Nos. 53225/53340 (10-03924).
02/24/2010MotionFiled Stipulation. Nos. 53225/53340.
02/24/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: April 5, 2010. Nos. 53225/53340.
03/25/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. Nos. 53225/53340. (10-07914)
04/02/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: May 4, 2010. Nos. 53225/53340 (10-08607).
05/04/2010MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Permission to Exceed Page Limit. Nos. 53225/53340. 10-11489
05/06/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages is approved. 37 pages granted. Nos. 53225/53340. 10-11681
05/06/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 53225/53340.
05/06/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. Nos. 53225/53340.
11/09/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 15, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel in Las Vegas. Nos. 53225/53340. 10-29401
11/19/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Rechedule Oral Argument Currently Scheduled for December 15, 2010. Nos. 53225/53340. 10-30279
11/24/2010MotionFiled Stipulation to Reschedule Oral Argument. Nos. 53225/53340. 10-30673
11/24/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant appellant's motion to continue the oral argument of this matter. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for December 15, 2010, at 1:30 p.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 53225/53340. 10-30704
12/15/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for February 16, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the Southern Nevada Panel. (SNP11-NS/JH/RP) Nos. 53225/53340. 10-32816
02/02/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 53225/53340. 11-03340
02/16/2011Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP11S-NS/JH/RP
07/07/2011Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. "Affirmed." Before Saitta, Hardesty and Parraguirre, JJ. Author: Saitta, J. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. 11-20160
08/01/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 53225\53340. 11-23057
08/01/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2011. Nos. 53225/53340 11-23057
08/24/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 50262/52496, 54779, 55159, 49732, 51629, 53436/54173, 55228, 50668, 57649, 53518, 54165, 46623, and 53225/53340. (Letter entered in 50262 as document no. 11-26481.)