Case Information: 53356 | |||
Short Caption: | PACIFICARE OF NEVADA VS. DIST. CT. (SADLER) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52919 , 62111 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A566980 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jones Vargas - check no. 5296. | ||
03/03/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. With supporting Points and Authorities. | 09-05400 | |
03/03/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alernative, Prohibition. | 09-05401 | |
03/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Emergency Motion to Stay Order Permitting Discovery to Proceed in Excess of District Court's Jurisdiction. | 09-05404 | |
03/18/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Real Parties in Interest's Opposition to Petition's Emergency Motion to Stay Order Permitting Discovery to Proceed in Excess of District Court's Jurisdiction. | 09-06893 | |
04/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File Joinder of PacifiCare Life Assurance Company, United Healthcare Insurance Company and United Health Group, Inc. in Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the alternative, Prohibition of PacifiCare of Nevada, Inc. and to Augment the Record. | 09-08467 | |
04/09/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We therefore deny the petition." Fn1 [We grant the motion for leave to file a joinder submitted by PacifiCare Life Assurance Company, United Health Care Insurance Company and United Health Group, LLC. The clerk of this court shall file the proposed joinder, which was provisionally received on April 3, 2009. Additionally, in light of this order, we deny as moot petitioner's motion for a stay.] NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-08903 | |
04/09/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Proposed Joinder of PacifiCare Life and Health Insurance Company, PacifiCare Life Assurance Company, United Healthcare Insurance Company and United Health Group, Inc. in Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alterntive, Prohibition of PacifiCare of Nevada, Inc. and Augmentation of the Record. | 09-08470 | |
05/05/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-09647 | |
05/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |