Case Information: 53350 | |||
Short Caption: | DOMINGUEZ VS. BIEKER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A573053 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/06/2009 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-05272 | |
03/02/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-05273 | |
03/06/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt | 09-05885 | |
03/10/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal and Waive Filing Fee | 09-06049 | |
03/25/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We defer ruling on motion to voluntarily dismiss pending receipt of the filing fee. Appellant: 15 days for $250 filing fee. | 09-07530 | |
03/30/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The appellant has filed a motion to withdraw the appeal. | 09-07918 | |
04/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Stovall & Associates. Check no. 27381. | ||
05/13/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 09-11893 | |
05/13/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |