Case Information: 53349 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: ESTATE OF MICHAEL LEE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P058675 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/16/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Anita L. Lee check no. 724. | ||
03/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-05266 | |
03/16/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Appellant Patricia Johnson. | 09-06595 | |
03/16/2009 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 9/16/08. Court Reporter: Sonja Riley. | 09-06640 | |
03/18/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney for Respondent. | 09-06859 | |
03/23/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Christopher J. Phillips, Esq. representing Respondent Kim Price in the place and stead of Sean M. Tanko, Esq. | 09-07229 | |
03/23/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Substitution of Attorneys. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07231 | |
04/07/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. (submitted by appellants Patricia Johnson and Anita Lee) | 09-08682 | |
05/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record, Directing Response, and Approving Substitution of Counsel. Record on Appeal due: 60 days. Respondent's Response due: 90 days. We direct the clerk of this court to remove Mr. Tanko from this court's docket as counsel of record for respondent. | 09-10947 | |
06/16/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols 1-2. | 09-14908 | |
06/16/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Respondent's failure to file the response in compliance with our May 4 order warrants the conditional imposition of sanctions. Respondent shall, within 15 days pay $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. This sanction shall be automatically vacated, however, if respondent files and serves her response to appellants' proper person appeal statement within ten days from the date of this order. Fn1 [We note that payment of the $500 conditional sanctions will not relieve respondent of the obligation to file the response.] | 09-23160 | |
10/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-24232 | |
10/15/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Request for Leave of Court to File Reply to Respondent's Response to Appellants Appeal; Proposed Reply. | 09-25156 | |
10/15/2009 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Proposed Reply to Respondent's Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-25157 | |
11/13/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn1 [Appellants filed a motion requesting leave to file a reply to respondent's response. We grant the motion. The reply was considered as part of the resolution of this appeal.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-27734 | |
12/08/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-29241 | |
12/08/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/18/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 11, 2009. | 09-29241 |