Case Information: 53359 | |||
Short Caption: | ABRAMS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C241128 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/24/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-05516 | |
03/04/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/17/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days (Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order filed on 3/5/09.) | 09-06715 | |
03/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-07017 | |
03/24/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 3/5/09. | 09-07439 | |
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-08510 | |
06/24/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-15684 | |
06/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/25/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Supplemental Record due: 40 days. | 09-20608 | |
09/08/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/07/08. | 09-21696 | |
10/06/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Janie Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/8/08, 8/5/08. | 09-24376 | |
10/13/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 2 | 09-24980 | |
11/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-27121 | |
12/01/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-28434 | |
12/01/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2009. | 09-28434 |