Case Information: 53360 | |||
Short Caption: | RENO NEWSPAPERS, INC. VS. GIBBONS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 08OC003641B | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 03/01/2010 at 11:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 03/01/2010 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Burton Bartlett & Glogovac check no. 19055. | ||
03/04/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 09-05519 | |
03/06/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/04/08. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services (Stacey Winn). | 09-05863 | |
03/13/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sunshine Reporters stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/4/08. | 09-06470 | |
03/19/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-07033 | |
06/30/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-16172 | |
06/30/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 09-16173 | |
07/29/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-18479 | |
08/31/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-21220 | |
02/09/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on March 1, 2010 at 11:30 a.m. (En Banc) | 10-03675 | |
03/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/15/2011 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Saitta, C.J. Majority: Saitta/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 79. EN BANC | 11-38659 | |
12/27/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (Solicitor General C. Wayne Howle has assumed responsibility in place of Chief James T. Spencer for representing the interests of Respondents in this action). | 11-39764 | |
01/09/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-00747 | |
01/09/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 10, 2012. | 12-00747 |